+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 4:52 PM 7/16/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 175 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 494(FIN)
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 494(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ENGROSSED
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B;
- NR: OLSON, BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(HSS); FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN4: ZERO(LWF); FN5: ZERO(LWF)
- FN6: ZERO(REV)
- FN7: (ADM/ALL DEPTS)
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR
- DP: STEVENS G; NR: COWDERY, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(HSS); FN2: ZERO(HSS);
- FN3: ZERO(HSS); FN4: ZERO(LWF);
- FN5: ZERO(LWF); FN6: ZERO(REV);
- FN7: (ADM/ALL DEPTS)
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, MOSES, CHENAULT,
- FATE, FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: JOULE
- FN1: ZERO(HSS); FN2: ZERO(HSS)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN4: ZERO(LWF); FN5: ZERO(LWF)
- FN6: ZERO(REV)
- FN7: (ADM/ALL DEPTS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 TITLE AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 494(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y39 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, LYNN, SEATON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 494(FIN) AM
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, MEYER
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN