+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- W&M RPT CS(W&M) NT 4DP 4AM
- DP: SAMUELS, GRUENBERG, WILSON, MOSES;
- AM: WEYHRAUCH, OGG, KOHRING, HAWKER
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, SAMUELS, KAPSNER,
- HEINZE
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, CHENAULT, CISSNA,
- KOTT
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, KOOKESH
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO, WILSON
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- W&M, FIN
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor