+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/13 CHAPTER 7 SLA 17
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/14/17
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- 11:47 AM 5/11/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N4 E3
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On April 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 49(L&C)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 49(L&C)
On April 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, OLSON, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT SCS(L&C) 7DP
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: COSTELLO, MEYER, GARDNER
- NR: STEVENS
- FN1: (CED)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 49(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 49(FIN)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: GARA, THOMPSON, WILSON, ORTIZ, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DNP: KNOPP
- DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO
- L&C RPT 6DP 1DNP
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor