+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLER
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DICK
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, EDGMON, P.WILSON
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: (EED)
- NR: PRUITT, FEIGE
- DP: CISSNA, P.WILSON, SEATON, KAWASAKI, DICK
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) 5DP 2NR
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor