+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: GATTIS, OLSON
- DP: JOHNSON, FEIGE, HERRON, KREISS-TOMKINS, SEATON
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 5DP 2NR
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- FSH, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/13
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor