+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/02
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/7 CHAPTER 40 SLA 02
On May 21, 2002 in the House:
- 3:49 PM 5/21/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 480(STA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 480(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2OR 5/7/02
On April 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: STEVENS, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS, LEMAN
- L&C RPT 4DP
On March 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 26, 2002 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 480(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 480(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/02
On March 20, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FATE, HAYES, COGHILL
- DP: WILSON, CRAWFORD, STEVENS, JAMES,
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor