+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 39 SLA 01
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- DP: PEARCE, ELLIS, COWDERY, PHILLIPS,
- THERRIAULT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 5DP 5/2/01
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 48(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 48(RES)
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- DONLEY
- PHILLIPS, LEMAN, THERRIAULT, LINCOLN,
- KELLY, GREEN, AUSTERMAN, COWDERY,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WARD, TAYLOR, HALFORD
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N26 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, OGAN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 48(RES)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 48(RES)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- DP: OGAN, JAMES, MEYER, COGHILL,
- JUD RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR
- ROKEBERG; NR: KOOKESH, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- KAPSNER, KERTTULA, MASEK
- DP: STEVENS, CHENAULT, GREEN, FATE,
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 7DP
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LANCASTER
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- RES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor