+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On April 25, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BRICE
On April 3, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 26, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, JUDICIARY, FINANCE