+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN4: (EED)
- FN3: (EED)
- FN2: (EED)
- FN1: (EED)
- NR: PRAX, GILLHAM, CRONK
- DP: HOPKINS, ZULKOSKY, DRUMMOND, STORY
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) 4DP 3NR
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21