+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/26/96
- 10:35 AM 6/12/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 100 SLA 96
On May 7, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 478(L&C)
On May 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PLACED AT BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/96
- L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS (H) ZERO FN (DCED)
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 478
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- NR: ELTON, SANDERS
- DP: MASEK
- DP: KOTT, ROKEBERG, KUBINA, PORTER
- L&C RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor