+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 1997 in the House:
- FIN RPT 3DP 4NR
- DP: MULDER, KOHRING, DAVIES
- NR: THERRIAULT, MARTIN, DAVIS, KELLY
- FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/COR)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On May 2, 1997 in the House:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 28, 1997 in the House:
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: JAMES, ELTON, BERKOWITZ, DYSON, IVAN
- NR: VEZEY
- FISCAL NOTE (COR)
On April 25, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BRICE
On April 24, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On April 3, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 26, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KUBINA
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY, FINANCE