+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (66)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 2:38 PM 7/25/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/4 CHAPTER 111 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/2/14
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N7
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- TAKEN UP IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N14
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N14
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N14
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N13
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N16
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y4 N16
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y5 N14 A1
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y7 N13
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 47(JUD) AM S
- PASSED Y14 N6
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSHB 47(JUD) AM S
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DYSON
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 2DNP 1NR
- DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE
- DNP: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- NR: DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- FN3: ZERO(DEC)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DNR)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 47(JUD)
- PASSED Y26 N12 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HIGGINS, NAGEAK, MUNOZ, HOLMES, NEUMAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 47(JUD)
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/12 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, T.WILSON, GATTIS
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: MILLETT, LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER
- NR: FOSTER, GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- FN3: ZERO(DEC)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(DNR)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, MILLETT
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/13
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor