+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 47
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, ZULKOSKY
- PASSED Y37 N2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 47
- LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: CARPENTER, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 8DP 3NR
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- FIN REPLACES STA REFERRAL
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: CRONK
- DP: FIELDS, ORTIZ, ZULKOSKY
- TRB RPT 3DP 1NR
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- TRB, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor