+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/10
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/9
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/8
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/7
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/6
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/5
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/4
On May 1, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/3
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- ANDERSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADPTD Y31 N6 E2 A1
- COURT RULE(S) FLD Y22 N10 E2 A6
- PASSED Y21 N14 E2 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 468(JUD)
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N23 E1 A3
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/28 - ON 4/29 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2004
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(CRT)
- NR: HOLM, OGG, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- DP: ANDERSON; DNP: GARA, SAMUELS;
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 1DP 2DNP 4NR
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor