+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- CRA RPT 5DP
- PREVIOUS H FISCAL NOTE (REV)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- CRA, L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 467
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/94
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, GRUSSENDORF
- FIN RPT 6DP 4NR
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN
- DP: HOFFMAN, BROWN, FOSTER
- NR: HANLEY, MARTIN, PARNELL, THERRIAULT
- -PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/16/94
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/16/94
- NR: SANDERS, DAVIES, WILLIS, OLBERG
- DP: WILLIAMS, TOOHEY
- CRA RPT 2DP 4NR
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- CRA, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)