+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/29/98
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 141 SLA 98
- 9:20 AM 6/9/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 464(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/98
On May 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FNS (ADM, DHSS)
- DP: GREEN, DUNCAN; NR: MACKIE
- STA RPT 2DP 1NR
On April 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 464(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y39 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 18, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/98
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 3/20/98
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- HODGINS
- DP: JAMES, BERKOWITZ, ELTON, IVAN, RYAN,
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 6DP
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- MASEK, JOULE
- DP: FOSTER; NR: RYAN, MULDER, KOTT,
- MLV RPT 1DP 5NR
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- MLV, STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor