+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 461(STA) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- PASSED Y33 N6 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 461(STA) AM
- JOULE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- TAKE UP RECON SAME DAY WITHDRAWN
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N20 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 A1
- AM NO 4 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- MOVED DOWN THE CALENDAR
- MOVED TO FOLLOW SB 365
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 A1
- AM TO AM 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 6 AS AM FAILED Y12 N26 E1 A1
- AM NO 7 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 8 NOT OFFERED
- NEW AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- AM NO 6 OFFERED
On May 1, 2004 in the House:
- DP: SEATON, LYNN, HOLM; NR: GRUENBERG,
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 2NR
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH STA REPORT
- WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- SAMUELS, WOLF, CISSNA
- DP: MORGAN; NR: ANDERSON, KOOKESH,
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 1DP 5NR
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- CRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor