+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 33 SLA 15
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/15
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- 11:20 AM 5/22/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 46
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, ELLIS, COGHILL, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- BISHOP, EGAN, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, GARDNER, DUNLEAVY, KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 46
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 5DP
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEVENS, ELLIS
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 46
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, GARA, MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON, TARR, VAZQUEZ
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 46
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- L&C RPT 6DP
- DP: JOSEPHSON, COLVER, HUGHES, TILTON, LEDOUX, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(MVA)
- COSPONSOR(S): TILTON
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COLVER, HUGHES, OLSON, LEDOUX
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor