+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/13
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:49 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 27 SLA 13
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 46
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2013
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, OLSON,
- COGHILL, MCGUIRE, FAIRCLOUGH, EGAN, STEDMAN, MEYER, STEVENS, ELLIS, HUGGINS
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 46
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: EGAN, FRENCH, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH
- TRA RPT 5DP
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL, STEDMAN
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 46
- PASSED Y33 E7
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, GARA, REINBOLD, T.WILSON, STOLTZE
- VERSION: HB 46
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GATTIS, P.WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: LYNN, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON
- TRA RPT 6DP
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: HUGHES, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, KELLER, LYNN
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- STA, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor