+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 2:55 PM 6/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 96 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/03
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 46(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, BUNDE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 46(STA)
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, FRENCH, ELLIS;
- NR: OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: STEVENS G, HOFFMAN, DYSON, GUESS;
- NR: COWDERY
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N22 1E V1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 46(STA)
- PASSED Y32 E1 A6 V1
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 46(STA)
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP 2NR
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, HOLM, LYNN,
- DAHLSTROM; NR: BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA