+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 8:30 AM 6/8/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 130 SLA 98
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N2 A2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS W/SCS (NEW TITLE) TO 1ST SUPP CAL
- TITLE CHANGE AUTHORIZED BY SCR 31
- (H) AND (S) FNS (DHSS-4)
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 459(RLS)
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- (H) FNS (DHSS-3)
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- NR: ADAMS, SHARP; AM: PARNELL
- DP: PEARCE, PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On April 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- HES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP:WILKEN, LEMAN, ELLIS; NR: WARD, GREEN
- (H) FNS (DHSS-4)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FIN
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 459(FIN) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y33 N3 E3 A1
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/98
On March 26, 1998 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, MULDER, MARTIN,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
- 4 FNS (DHSS) 3/11/98
- KOHRING, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES,
- DAVIS, KELLY, FOSTER
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- 4 FNS (DHSS)
- REC ADDITIONAL REFERRAL TO FIN
- KEMPLEN, BRICE
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, BUNDE, PORTER,
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 6DP
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor