+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 14, 2002 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/5 CHAPTER 117 SLA 02
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/03
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- 9:59 AM 6/17/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 455(CRA)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y16 N- A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 455(CRA)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, TAYLOR
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- ADVANCED TO 3RD READING FLD Y14 N6
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/02
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: ELTON
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, STEVENS;
- RES RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 1DP 3NR
- LINCOLN
- DP: TORGERSON; NR: KELLY, AUSTERMAN,
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- CRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2002 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 455(CRA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y33 E7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 455(CRA)
On April 3, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- KERTTULA, MORGAN
- DP: SCALZI, MURKOWSKI, MEYER,
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 5DP
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS