+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (65)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 3:04 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 70 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N4 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 452(RES)
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 452(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 1DP 3NR 1AM
- DP: WILKEN; NR: GREEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN;
- AM: OLSON
- FN2: (DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: (DFG)
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 27
- NR: OGAN, DYSON;
- DP: ELTON, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- FN2: (DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN4: (DFG)
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/23/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 452(FIN) AM
- LETTER FOR JOURNAL
- PASSED Y33 N2 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 452(FIN) AM
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 6NR
- DP: MEYER, MOSES, HARRIS, WILLIAMS;
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE, CROFT,
- FOSTER, CHENAULT
- FN2: (DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 5NR
- DP: GRUENBERG; NR: HOLM, GARA,
- ANDERSON, OGG, MCGUIRE
- FN2: (DFG)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 1DP 3NR 1AM
- DP: LYNN; NR: CRAWFORD, GATTO,
- ANDERSON; AM: ROKEBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (DFG)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD, FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor