+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (54)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/04
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 109 SLA 04
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 451
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 451
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- STEVENS B, BUNDE
- FIN RPT 5DP
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON,
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN6: (CRT)
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN6: (CRT)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, OGAN, THERRIAULT
- JUD RPT 4DP
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 451
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 451
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2004
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, JOULE, CROFT, FATE, FOSTER,
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN6: (CRT)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- FN5: (CRT)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- GRUENBERG, OGG, MCGUIRE
- DP: GARA, HOLM, SAMUELS, ANDERSON,
- JUD RPT 7DP
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor