+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- NR: COWDERY
- DP: STEVENS G, HOFFMAN, DYSON, GUESS;
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: BERKOWITZ, GRUENBERG, SEATON,
- WEYHRAUCH; NR: HOLM, LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 45
- MEYER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N7 E2 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, CROFT, MEYER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 45
- PASSED Y29 N7 E2 A2
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES, WILSON, HARRIS
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- DP: KOOKESH, CISSNA, SAMUELS,
- CRA RPT 6DP
- KERTTULA, STEVENS, SEATON
- ANDERSON, CHENAULT, MORGAN
- FN1: ZERO(UA)
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, JOULE, CISSNA,
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- CRA, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor