+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- NR:TAYLOR, TORGERSON; DNP:DONLEY, ELLIS
- TITLE CHANGE AUTHORIZED BY SCR 13
- JUD RPT SCS 2DNP 2NR NEW TITLE
On May 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 16, 1999 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 45(FIN) AM
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On May 15, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/99
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR
On April 28, 1999 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/26/99
- NR: THERRIAULT, AUSTERMAN
- GRUSSENDORF, DAVIS, WILLIAMS, FOSTER;
- DP: MULDER, BUNDE, KOHRING, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- DNP: SMALLEY, KERTTULA; AM: OGAN
- DP: JAMES, WHITAKER, HUDSON;
- STA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 2DNP 1AM
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor