+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/24/94
- 11:45 AM 5/18/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/26 CHAPTER 66 SLA 94
On May 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/94
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y10 N10
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME
- (S) ADOPTED FIN LETTER OF INTENT
- PASSED Y16 N4
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS APPLY(DPS,LAW,H.FIN)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 1DNP 3NR SAME TITLE
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 447(FIN)
On April 15, 1994 in the House:
- DP: GRUSSENDORF, NAVARRE, BROWN
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, HANLEY, PARNELL
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
- DP: THERRIAULT, FOSTER
- NR: MARTIN
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/DNR) 4/15/94
- -2 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (LAW, DPS) 2/4/94
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- -2 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DPS, LAW) 2/4/94
- -FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/14/94
- DP: DAVIES,MULDER,BUNDE,WILLIAMS,GREEN
- DP: HUDSON, CARNEY, JAMES, FINKELSTEIN
- RES RPT CS(RES) 9DP
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- -FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 2/4/94
- -2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, LAW) 2/4/94
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor