+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/23/96
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 99 SLA 96
- 10:40 AM 6/11/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N1
- ELLIS, SALO, LEMAN, GREEN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLER, RIEGER
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 446 AM
On April 29, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On April 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 4/29 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y12 N8
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/96
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAW)
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CROSS SPONSORS: HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- JUDICIARY
- KELLY, DONLEY
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 446 AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/06/96
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
- NR: FINKELSTEIN
- DP: GREEN, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor