+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- NR: GUESS, WILKEN
- DP: DYSON, DAVIS;
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- WAGONER, OLSON
- STEVENS G, LINCOLN, FRENCH, ELLIS,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, DYSON,
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 443
- PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 443
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: SEATON, COGHILL, WOLF, WILSON
- HES RPT 4DP
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor