+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 22, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 90 SLA 08
On June 10, 2008 in the House:
- 10:47 AM 6/9/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, HUGGINS
- NR: STEDMAN, DYSON, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- FN4: ZERO(H.FIN/REV)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/12/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 44(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, MCGUIRE, THERRIAULT, THOMAS, DAVIS,
- WILKEN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 44(FIN)
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 44(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 44(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GARDNER
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(H.FIN/REV)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- DP: HAWKER, CRAWFORD, STOLTZE, JOULE, THOMAS, KELLY, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- NR: COGHILL, DOLL
- STA RPT CS(STA) 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: JOHNSON, JOHANSEN, ROSES, LYNN
- AM: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- FN3: (REV)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
- FN2: (REV)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- DP: LEDOUX, FAIRCLOUGH, DAHLSTROM, BUCH, ROSES
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 5DP 1AM
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/5/07
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor