+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- AM 2 TO AM 5 AS AM ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
- IN 2ND READING W/AM 4 PENDING
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y14 N25 E1
- AM NO 5 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 5 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- AM 3 TO AM 5 AS AM ADOPTED Y33 N4 E1 A2
- AM NO 5 AS AM ADOPTED Y34 N3 E1 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y34 N5 E1
- CISSNA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N3 E1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 44(FIN) AM
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y29 N8 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 44(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 & ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y22 N15 E3
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 4 OFFERED
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, MILLETT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2009
On April 11, 2009 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 6NR
- DP: GARA, CRAWFORD, AUSTERMAN
- NR: THOMAS, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON, JOULE, HAWKER, STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN3: ZERO(REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: DAHLSTROM, PETERSEN, MILLETT, EDGMON
- DNP: RAMRAS
- DP: TUCK, JOHANSEN
- ENE RPT CS(ENE) 2DP 1DNP 4NR
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- ENE, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09