+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 10:50 PM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 44 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/2/04
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, DAHLSTROM
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y15 N- A5
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 438(STA)
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 438(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS(STA) 2DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN; NR: THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- NR: GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 438(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y31 E5 A4
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 438(JUD) AM
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA, GRUENBERG,
- MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 1DP 2NR 3AM
- DP: LYNN; NR: COGHILL, WEYHRAUCH;
- AM: GRUENBERG, SEATON, HOLM
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- TRA RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: OGG, STEPOVICH, HOLM; NR: MASEK,
- KOHRING
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA, JUD