+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/29 CHAPTER 31 SLA 02
On May 21, 2002 in the House:
- TECHNICAL CORRECTION
- 3:49 PM 5/21/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- LEMAN, ELLIS, WARD, COWDERY, AUSTERMAN,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS, TAYLOR,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 438(STA)
- THERRIAULT, DONLEY, WILKEN, LINCOLN,
- KELLY, STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 438(STA)
On April 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(H.STA/ADM)
- DP: THERRIAULT, DAVIS, HALFORD
- STA RPT 3DP
On April 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 438(STA)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 438(STA)
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 3, 2002 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP
- DP: WILSON, STEVENS, JAMES, FATE,
- COGHILL
- FN2: ZERO(H.STA/ADM)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: (ADM)
- HAYES, CHENAULT
- DP: MASEK, KOTT, GREEN, MURKOWSKI,
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- MLV, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor