+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- 1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 53 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/18
On April 28, 2018 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 43(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, BISHOP, MACKINNON
- MICCICHE, GARDNER, HUGHES, BEGICH, EGAN, MEYER
- PASSED Y20 N-
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 43(JUD)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
- NR: COSTELLO, KELLY, SHOWER
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: VON IMHOF, BEGICH, GIESSEL
- NR: MICCICHE
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, JUD
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 43(JUD)
- PASSED Y40
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KNOPP, TARR, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 43(JUD)
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, PARISH
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR
- DP: EASTMAN, KOPP, FANSLER, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
- NR: REINBOLD
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, EASTMAN
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- HSS RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: KITO
- AM: EASTMAN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, JUD
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor