+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 1DP 4NR
- DP: DYSON;
- NR: GUESS, GREEN, DAVIS, WILKEN
- FN2: (EED)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/23/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDU CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 425(EDU)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, JOULE, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 425(EDU)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(EDU) NT 4DP 4NR
- DP: CROFT, MOSES, FATE, FOSTER;
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- FN2: (EED)
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(EDU) NT 6DP 1NR
- DP: GATTO, WOLF, COGHILL, SEATON,
- KAPSNER, WILSON; NR: CISSNA
- FN1: (EED)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- EDU RPT CS(EDU) NT 1DP 2NR 3AM
- DP: GARA; NR: OGG, WOLF; AM: SEATON,
- WILSON, GATTO
- FN1: (EED)
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDU, HES, FIN