+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/19/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/20 CHAPTER 9 SLA 05
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- 9:36 AM 4/5/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 5
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E4 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS HB 42(CRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, STEVENS G, OLSON, COWDERY, FRENCH, DYSON, WAGONER,
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 42(CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CRA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2005
- SEEKINS, DAVIS, STEVENS B
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT SCS 3DP NEW TITLE
- FN2: ZERO(H.TRA/DOT)
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 5
- DP: STEVENS G, STEDMAN, ELLIS
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(H.TRA/DOT)
- DP: HUGGINS, FRENCH, KOOKESH, COWDERY
- TRA RPT 4DP
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- TRA, CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 42
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: HAWKER, WEYHRAUCH, CROFT, HOLM, KELLY, STOLTZE, FOSTER, MEYER, CHENAULT
- FN2: ZERO(H.TRA/DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: HB 42
- COSPONSOR(S): ALL MEMBERS
- ANDERSON, BERKOWITZ, CISSNA, COGHILL, CRAWFORD, DAHLSTROM, GARA, GARDNER, GATTO,
- GRUENBERG, GUTTENBERG, HARRIS, JOULE, KAPSNER, KERTTULA,
- KOHRING, KOTT, LEDOUX, LYNN, MCGUIRE, MOSES, NEUMAN, OLSON, RAMRAS, ROKEBERG,
- SALMON, SAMUELS, SEATON, THOMAS, WEYHRAUCH, WILSON
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, KELLY, HOLM, CHENAULT, STOLTZE, HAWKER, CROFT, MEYER
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: SALMON, NEUMAN, THOMAS, GATTO, ELKINS
- FN2: ZERO(H.TRA/DOT)
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DOT)
- DP: SALMON, LEDOUX, NEUMAN, OLSON, THOMAS
- CRA RPT 5DP
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- CRA, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/04
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor