+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 106 SLA 04
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 3:04 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N11 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 418(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 418(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- BUNDE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON, BUNDE
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS, DAVIS;
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- NR: STEVENS G
- FN2: (CED)
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/21/04
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 418(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 418(FIN)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, CHENAULT, FATE,
- FOSTER, HARRIS, WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE,
- JOULE, CROFT
- FN2: (CED)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- FN1: (CED)
- ANDERSON; NR: GUTTENBERG
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, ROKEBERG, DAHLSTROM,
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 1NR
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor