+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- 3:46 PM 6/25/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 138 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 417
- PASSED Y17 N- A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 417
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS B;
- NR: HOFFMAN, BUNDE, OLSON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4NR 1AM
- AM: OGAN;
- NR: ELTON, DYSON, WAGONER, SEEKINS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On April 13, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 417
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 417
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT 11DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, JOULE,
- CROFT, MOSES, CHENAULT, FATE, FOSTER,
- HARRIS, WILLIAMS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: STEPOVICH, GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA,
- WOLF; NR: MASEK, DAHLSTROM
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- O&G RPT 2DP 3AM
- DP: ROKEBERG, MCGUIRE; AM: HEINZE,
- CRAWFORD, HOLM
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES