+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/6 CHAPTER 9 SLA 94
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- 2:40 PM 3/22/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 415(JUD)
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 4DP
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAW)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
- SECTIONAL ANALYSIS/H SUPPLEMENT NO. 12
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 415(JUD)
- PASSED Y34 N1 E4 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
- DP: GREEN, JAMES, PORTER, PHILLIPS
- DP: NORDLUND, DAVIDSON
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 2/22/94
- ANALYSIS PUBLISHED
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDCIARY
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor