+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/1/00
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/31 CHAPTER 92 SLA 00
- 10:25AM 5/12/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N5 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y16 N3 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 414(O&G)
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- DP: TIM KELLY; OR: ELLIS, MILLER,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1DP AND 4 OR 4/24/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CALENDAR
- LEMAN, PEARCE
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.O&G #1)
- LINCOLN
- NR: HALFORD, TAYLOR, GREEN, PETE KELLY,
- RES RPT 5NR
On March 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 414(O&G)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 21, 2000 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/22 CALENDAR
- O&G CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/00
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.O&G)
- KEMPLEN, GREEN
- DP: WHITAKER, DYSON, SMALLEY, PORTER,
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) NT 6DP
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- O&G
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor