+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN2: (EED/FUND CAP)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 413
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 413
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 14, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2022
- SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR
- SESSION CANCELED 5/12 - ON 5/13 CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- FN2: (EED/FUND CAP)
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- NR: THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, RASMUSSEN, EDGMON, MERRICK
- DP: LEBON, CARPENTER, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 4DP 6NR
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC
- FN2: (EED/FUND CAP)
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- NR: ZULKOSKY, GILLHAM, CRONK
- DP: HOPKINS, STORY
- EDC RPT 2DP 3NR
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE EDUCATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor