+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/22 CHAPTER 30 SLA 16
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- 3:39 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 2DP 5NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 30
- DP: KELLY, MACKINNON
- NR: MICCICHE, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, HOFFMAN
- FN4: (DFG)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 41(FIN)
- PASSED Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 41(FIN)
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- FN3: (DFG)
- AM: STEVENS
- NR: GIESSEL
- DP: COSTELLO, MEYER
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y35 N2 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 41(FIN) AM
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 41(FIN) AM
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- DP: PRUITT, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 5NR
- NR: KAWASAKI, WILSON, GARA, GUTTENBERG, GATTIS
- FN3: (DFG)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- FN2: (DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: HERRON, FOSTER
- DP: ORTIZ, STUTES
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 2DP 2NR
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- FSH, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15