+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (74)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 2:40 P.M. 7/1/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 32 SLA 22
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STUTES
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N2 E2
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR READ AND HELD
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 41(FIN)
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 41(FIN) AM S
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CAL
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, REVAK, STEVENS, STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOLLAND, MICCICHE
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2022
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP
- FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 8
- FN8: INDETERMINATE(GOV/SP APPROP)
- NR: WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- FN6: ZERO(DFG)
- FN7: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
- FN9: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- DP: REVAK, KIEHL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- RES RPT 5DP
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(GOV/SP APPROP)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 41(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 N2 E1
- MOTION TO ADOPT EFFECTIVE DATE(S)
- MOTION TO DIVIDE EFD FAILED Y13 N26 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 N3 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN, WOOL, VANCE, TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 41(FIN)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 9DP 2NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, THOMPSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
- NR: JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(GOV/SP APPROP)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, STORY
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- NR: MCCABE, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FSH RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: STORY, ORTIZ, TARR
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(GOV/SP APPROP)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(DFG)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- FSH, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor