+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/4/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 85 SLA 06
- 2:07 PM 6/21/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 409(L&C)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 409(L&C)
On May 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2006
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, BUNDE, OLSON, DYSON, STEDMAN
- NR: HOFFMAN
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: DAVIS
- DP: BUNDE, ELLIS, SEEKINS, STEVENS B
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
On April 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 409(L&C)
- VERSION: CSHB 409(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y29 N6 E2 A3
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2006
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- DP: FOSTER, MEYER;
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 6NR
- NR: STOLTZE, KERTTULA, JOULE, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, MOSES
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- AM: GUTTENBERG
- DNP: CRAWFORD;
- DP: LYNN, LEDOUX, ROKEBERG, KOTT;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 1DNP 1AM
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor