+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 15, 2000 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(HES) NT 7DP
- DP: MURKOWSKI, CROFT, GREEN, KOTT,
- JAMES, ROKEBERG, KERTTULA
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 4/13/00
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, MURKOWSKI, CROFT,
- JAMES, ROKEBERG
On April 13, 2000 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 5DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, DYSON, COGHILL, WHITAKER,
- KEMPLEN; NR: BRICE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, JUD, FIN
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, JUD, FIN