+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (78)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/29/94
- 10:00 AM 6/7/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 1994 in the House:
- (H) ADOPTED CC LETTER OF INTENT
- EFFECTIVE DATES SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADPT Y40 N- CCS HB 407
On May 8, 1994 in the House:
- CC REPORT RECEIVED
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CC REPORT READ AND SIGNED
- FOSTER, PHILLIPS, GRUSSENDORF, SHARP
- ...SALO, JACKO
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH CC REPORT
- -PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 5/7/94
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y16 N4
- CC REPORT ADPT Y13 N7 CCS HB 407
- FAILED TO ADOPT LETTER OF INTENT Y9 N11
- FISCAL NOTE TO CCS PUBLISHED (DPS)
- CC REPORT READ
On May 6, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND
On May 3, 1994 in the House:
- H LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- S LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- *SHARP,SALO,JACKO
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y9 N11
On April 28, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- *FOSTER, PHILLIPS, GRUSSENDORF
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y- N39 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- RLS RPT 4CAL 1NR 4/25/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 407(FIN)
- (S) ADOPTED FIN LETTER OF INTENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y18 N- A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y12 N8
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y20 N-
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y13 N6 A1
- AM TO AM 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- FISCAL NOTE TO SCS PUBLISHED (DPS)
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
On April 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FISCAL NOTE (DPS)
- TRA RPT 3DP
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SHARP
- TRANSPORTATION, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY DAVIES
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 1 FAILED Y14 N24 A2
- PASSED Y39 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 407
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- DP: BROWN, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 6DP 5NR
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, MARTIN, HOFFMAN
- NR: HANLEY, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: NAVARRE, THERRIAULT
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/18/94
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/11/94
- NR: KOTT, SANDERS, B.DAVIS
- DP: VEZEY, G.DAVIS, OLBERG
- STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)