+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2004 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 1DP 1DNP 3NR
- DP: LYNN; DNP: SEATON; NR: GRUENBERG,
- HOLM, WEYHRAUCH
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- JT. PRIME SPONSOR REMOVED: WEYHRAUCH
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- JOINT PRIME SPONSOR: WEYHRAUCH
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- TRA RPT CS(TRA) NT 2DP 3NR
- DP: FATE, MASEK; NR: OGG, KOHRING,
- HOLM
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor