+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (72)
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- RETURNED TO GOVERNOR FOR PERMANENT FILING
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- GOVERNOR LINE ITEM VETOES SUSTAINED Y37 N1 E4 A18
- MOTION TO OVERRIDE LINE ITEM VETOES
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/19
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 2 FSSLA 19
- LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C)
- 4:50 P.M. 6/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS SSHB 40
On June 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
- CC REPORT: CCS SSHB 40 RECEIVED 6/8/19 9:24 P.M.
On June 9, 2019 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC RPT ADPTD Y35 N2 E3 CCS SSHB 40
- CC REPORT TAKEN UP UC
- CC REPORT: CCS SSHB 40 RECEIVED 6/8/19 9:23 P.M.
- CC REPORT READ AND HELD
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- STEDMAN (CHAIR), VON IMHOF, OLSON
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N38 E2
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FOSTER (CHAIR), WILSON, TILTON
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 40(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 40(FIN)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2019
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON
- AM: STEDMAN, OLSON
- DP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR 2AM SAME TITLE
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSSHB 40(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y33 N5 E2
- PASSED Y24 N14 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 40(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/10 - ON 4/11 CALENDAR
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/9 - ON 4/10 CALENDAR
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- AM: TILTON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 2NR 2AM
- NR: CARPENTER, MERRICK
- DP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, WILSON, FOSTER
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/9 CALENDAR
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor