+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/7/94
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 103 SLA 94
- 10:30 AM 5/17/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- LINCOLN, ELLIS, ZHAROFF, JACKO, LEMAN
- TAYLOR, PEARCE, KERTTULA, DONLEY,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, LITTLE,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 4(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/94
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DHSS-3, ADM-2, DCED)
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FNS PUBLISHED (DHSS-3, ADM-2, DCED)
- JUD RPT 4DP
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (CORR, DHSS, ADM-2)
- PREVIOUS H FN (DCED)
- HES RPT 5DP
On April 13, 1993 in the Senate:
- HES, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 12, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/93
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y31 N1 E8
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 4(JUD)
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 24, 1993 in the House:
- NR: DAVIDSON, KOTT, JAMES
- DP: PORTER, PHILLIPS, GREEN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (CORR) 3/24/93
- -PREVIOUS FN (DCED) 3/10/93
- -3 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS(ADM, ADM, DHSS)3/1O
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- -3 ZERO FNS (DHSS, ADM, ADM) 3/10/93
- -2 FISCAL NOTES (DCED, CORR) 3/10/93
- NR: B.DAVIES, G.DAVIS, BUNDE
- DNP: VEZEY
- DP: TOOHEY, B.DAVIS, NICHOLIA, BRICE
- HES RPT 4DP 1DNP 3NR
On January 11, 1993 in the House:
- HES, JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 4, 1993 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (13)
MACKIE
Type:
Primary Sponsor