+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BARNES
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RYAN
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES